Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 1022 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2325 Week
» 19641 Month
» 278500 Year
» 789602 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 143   09/1921
LNER (1924) 9143   01/1926
LNER (1946) 4638   10/02/1946
BR 64638   05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Reid
Class J37
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3709/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
To Service During 09/1921
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Eastfield (65A)
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge)
Service Life 41 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EFD Eastfield 9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 5w/e 10/03/1962
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 5w/e 12/05/1962
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1921 To Service To service as NBR Number 143
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
01/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9143    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4638    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64638    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64638 from Eastfield (65A)    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Barnes and Bell: Coatbridge    

prev prev