Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 416 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18219 Week
» 71235 Month
» 190762 Year
» 3217615 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
103 |
m/e |
06/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9103 |
m/e |
05/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4633 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64633 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J37 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
To Service |
During 06/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 08/06/1964 off Eastfield (65A) |
Service Life |
43 yrs , 8 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1921 |
EFD |
|
Eastfield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/06/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65A |
Eastfield |
5w/e |
12/05/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/06/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/10/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. |
SLS/194712 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1921 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 103 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
05/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9103 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4633 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64633 |
|
|
08/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64633 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|