Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 146 Today
» 963 Yesterday
» 146 Week
» 23284 Month
» 188184 Year
» 699286 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 101   06/1921
LNER (1924) 9101   03/1925
LNER (1946) 4632   03/02/1946
BR 64632   05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Reid
Class J37
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3706/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
To Service During 06/1921
Withdrawal During 12/1965 off Thornaby (51L)
Scrapping During 03/1966 at J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Service Life 44 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65K Polmont 4w/e 30/11/1963
65A Eastfield 4w/e 28/12/1963
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 22/08/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65K Polmont 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 08/08/1964
WDN   06/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1921 To Service To service as NBR Number 101
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9101    
02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4632    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64632    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Polmont (65K)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
22/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 64632 from Thornaby (51L)    
03/1966 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev