Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 1018 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2321 Week
» 19637 Month
» 278496 Year
» 789598 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 98   06/1921
LNER (1924) 9098   09/1924
LNER (1946) 4631   10/02/1946
BR 64631   09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Reid
Class J37
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3706/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
To Service During 06/1921
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
Scrapping During 04/1964 at Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge)
Service Life 41 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys
Information Due to an acute shortage of motive power in the winter/spring of 1963, six J37s were reinstated as "on loan to operating stock" - this was one of them

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962
62B Dundee Tay Bridge (Reinstated) m/e 01/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DEE Dundee Tay Bridge m/e 31/01/1946
WDN   29/12/1962
REINS 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 3w/e 25/01/1963
WDN   w/e 06/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1921 To Service To service as NBR Number 98
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
09/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9098    
02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4631    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64631    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64631 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
01/1963 Reinstated Reinstated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
04/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Barnes and Bell: Coatbridge    

prev prev