Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1676 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15082 Week
» 68098 Month
» 187625 Year
» 3214478 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
272 |
m/e |
01/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9272 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4624 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
64624 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
4w/e |
07/12/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/01/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1921 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 272 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22677 |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9272 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4624 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64624 |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
17/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64624 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|