|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Eastfield MPD | On 24/8 the locos. on shed ex works were 'J39' 4923/33; 'J83' 8445 and 'J69' 8623, and further locos. ex works during August that have been noted here are: 'K2' 1757; 'J37' 4541/79/84, 4604/17/21; 'J39' 4711, 4818, 4929; 'C15' 7468; 'J88' 8345; 'J83' 8473 (green); 'N15' 9136/77 an 9222. | SLS/194710 |
31/01/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. | SLS/195003 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1921 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 111 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22674 |
||
11/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9111 | ||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4621 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL) | ||
03/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (PKD) | ||
12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64621 | ||
19/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) | ||
29/05/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64621 from Grangemouth (65F) | ||
07/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |