12/07/1962 |
Inverurie Works (In Shops) |
In Shops: 42832, 55173, 57451, 64533/62, 64613/4/9, 65920. Awaiting Shops: 44016, D6142/4/7. Shopped during four weeks ending 30th June : 64537/47/79, 64606/25, 65297, 65319, D362, D2410, D5314, D6148/54, D8032. Condemned during four weeks ending 30th June: 40614, 55232, 64533/78, 65266/80, 65318/30, 69137. |
SLS/196208 |
02/11/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Cut Up) |
Shopped: 42737, 45475, D6149, D8030. Cut Up: 60819/27, 60937, 64627, 65253, 65341. Four weeks ending 30th November, 1963. Shopped: 42909, 44955, 65918, D6147/57. Cut Up: 57269, 57336, 57634, 60840/94, 64950, 64629. Four weeks ending 28th December, 1963. Shopped: 42919, 44703, D3930, D6140/42/45/52/54/55/56. Cut Up: 60898, 60972, 64557, 64600, 65900, 90019. Total for 1963: Steam-33 Shopped, 31 other repairs; Diesel-31 Shopped, 15 other repairs; Cut Up 86. Two weeks ending 10th January, 1964. Shopped: 61132, D6150. Cut Up: 60161, 64619. In Shops on 10th January: 44722, 64558/99, D368, D3935, D6139/51/53. Awaiting scrapping: 60089, 60159, 64579. |
SLS/196402 |