Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 146 Today
» 963 Yesterday
» 146 Week
» 23284 Month
» 188184 Year
» 699286 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 46   12/1920
LNER (1924) 9046   01/1925
LNER (1946) 4615   12/1946
BR 64615   12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Reid
Class J37
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3712/1920
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L739
Works Number 22668
To Service During 12/1920
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
Scrapping During 04/1964 at Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge)
Service Life 42 yrs , 29 dys
Information Due to an acute shortage of motive power in the winter/spring of 1963, six J37s were reinstated as "on loan to operating stock" - this was one of them

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962
62B Dundee Tay Bridge (Reinstated) m/e 01/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   29/12/1962
REINS 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 3w/e 25/01/1963
WDN   22/04/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1920 To Service To service as NBR Number 46
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22668
   
01/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9046    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4615    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64615    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64615 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
01/1963 Reinstated Reinstated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
04/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Barnes and Bell: Coatbridge    

prev prev