Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 56 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17859 Week
» 70875 Month
» 190402 Year
» 3217255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
403 |
m/e |
01/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9403 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4613 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64613 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1950 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. |
SLS/195004 |
12/07/1962 |
Inverurie Works (In Shops) |
In Shops: 42832, 55173, 57451, 64533/62, 64613/4/9, 65920. Awaiting Shops: 44016, D6142/4/7. Shopped during four weeks ending 30th June : 64537/47/79, 64606/25, 65297, 65319, D362, D2410, D5314, D6148/54, D8032. Condemned during four weeks ending 30th June: 40614, 55232, 64533/78, 65266/80, 65318/30, 69137. |
SLS/196208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1920 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 403 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22498 |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9403 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4613 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64613 |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
23/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64613 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|