Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 18 Today
» 1056 Yesterday
» 2100 Week
» 14269 Month
» 241030 Year
» 752132 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 403   01/1920
LNER (1924) 9403   11/1924
LNER (1946) 4613   11/1946
BR 64613   05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Reid
Class J37
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3701/1920
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L716
Works Number 22498
To Service During 01/1920
Withdrawal During 01/1964 off Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
Scrapping During 08/1964 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 44 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
POL Polmont 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1964
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 25/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC POL Polmont 28/09/1947
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/12/1951
WDN   23/01/1964
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 3w/e 01/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1920 To Service To service as NBR Number 403
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22498
   
11/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9403    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4613    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64613    
01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 64613 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
08/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev