Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 1021 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2324 Week
» 19640 Month
» 278499 Year
» 789601 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 402   01/1920
LNER (1924) 9402   04/1924
LNER (1946) 4612   10/1946
BR 64612   03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Reid
Class J37
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3701/1920
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L716
Works Number 22497
To Service During 01/1920
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Dunfermline Upper (62C)
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge)
Service Life 42 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys
Information Due to an acute shortage of motive power in the winter/spring of 1963, six J37s were reinstated as "on loan to operating stock" - this was one of them

Allocations
Code Name From Date
THJ Thornton Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64D Carstairs 4w/e 01/10/1955
64C Dalry Road 4w/e 12/05/1956
64A St Margarets 4w/e 27/09/1958
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962
64A St Margarets (Reinstated) m/e 01/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64D Carstairs 4w/e 01/10/1955
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 21/04/1956
WDN   29/12/1962
REINS 64A St Margarets 3w/e 25/01/1963
WDN   24/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1920 To Service To service as NBR Number 402
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22497
   
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9402    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4612    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ)    
03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64612    
01/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Carstairs (64D)    
12/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
27/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64612 from Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
01/1963 Reinstated Reinstated to St Margarets (64A)    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Barnes and Bell: Coatbridge    

prev prev