Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2182 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15588 Week
» 68604 Month
» 188131 Year
» 3214984 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
306 |
m/e |
01/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9306 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4610 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
64610 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/02/1963 |
Inverurie Works (In shops) |
In shops: 64610, D263; shopped in previous four weeks. 64592/7, D261, D2411. Scrapped between 21st January and 8th February: 57645, 64510/43/56, 65268, 68448/53/70. |
SLS/196303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1920 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 306 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22495 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9306 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4610 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64610 |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
04/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
01/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64610 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|