Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4136 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17542 Week
» 70558 Month
» 190085 Year
» 3216938 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
489 |
m/e |
12/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9489 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4604 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64604 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/08/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/08/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
On 24/8 the locos. on shed ex works were 'J39' 4923/33; 'J83' 8445 and 'J69' 8623, and further locos. ex works during August that have been noted here are: 'K2' 1757; 'J37' 4541/79/84, 4604/17/21; 'J39' 4711, 4818, 4929; 'C15' 7468; 'J88' 8345; 'J83' 8473 (green); 'N15' 9136/77 an 9222. |
SLS/194710 |
15/10/1962 |
Inverurie Works |
In shops: 45461, 64595, 65910; waiting: 80093. Awaiting scrapping: 44008, 47168, 47536, 57331/378/613, 65313, 69204. Scrapped five weeks ended 12/10; 57445/671, 64598/607, 64604/30, 64480/637/794. |
SLS/196211 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1919 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 489 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22277 |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9489 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4604 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64604 |
|
|
27/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64604 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
10/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|