Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2309 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15715 Week
» 68731 Month
» 188258 Year
» 3215111 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
486 |
m/e |
11/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9486 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4601 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64601 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J37 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L716 |
Works Number |
22274 |
To Service |
During 11/1919 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 off Grangemouth (65F) |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys |
Information |
Due to an acute shortage of motive power in the winter/spring of 1963, six J37s were reinstated as "on loan to operating stock" - this was one of them |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1919 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 486 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22274 |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9486 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4601 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64601 |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64601 from Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
11/02/1963 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Barnes and Bell: Coatbridge |
|
|