31/12/1946 |
Cowlairs Works |
The following locos. have recently been fitted with new Cowlairs boilers: Nos. 4499 (1932 of 4/44), 4589 (1885 of 11/41), 4594 (1934 of 5/44), 4599 (1929 of 4/44), 4609 (1951 of 12/44), 5221 (1920 of 12/43), 6329 (1926 of 1/44). All the foregoing are fitted with Pop safety valves and L.N.E.R. type fire doors. No. 4549 (1953 of 4/45) is fitted with a L.N.E. firedoor, and No. 7479 (1990 01/11/46) with a N.B. type firedoor. Nos. 5221, 5329 and 7479 have only one steam pipe in the smokebox, instead of the usual two. No. 4477 has been fitted with a Mark II. graduated brake, whist Nos. 5247 and 5339 have the Mark III. pattern. No. 4795 was fitted with American type injectors in July, 1946. |
SLS/194702 |
28/02/1950 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. |
SLS/195004 |
02/11/1963 |
Inverurie Works (In Shops) |
Shopped: 42737, 45475, D6149, D8030. Cut Up: 60819/27, 60937, 64627, 65253, 65341. Four weeks ending 30th November, 1963. Shopped: 42909, 44955, 65918, D6147/57. Cut Up: 57269, 57336, 57634, 60840/94, 64950, 64629. Four weeks ending 28th December, 1963. Shopped: 42919, 44703, D3930, D6140/42/45/52/54/55/56. Cut Up: 60898, 60972, 64557, 64600, 65900, 90019. Total for 1963: Steam-33 Shopped, 31 other repairs; Diesel-31 Shopped, 15 other repairs; Cut Up 86. Two weeks ending 10th January, 1964. Shopped: 61132, D6150. Cut Up: 60161, 64619. In Shops on 10th January: 44722, 64558/99, D368, D3935, D6139/51/53. Awaiting scrapping: 60089, 60159, 64579. |
SLS/196402 |
12/06/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Awaiting scrapping or shopping) |
In Works: 42273, 45176, 61076, 61103, D8032. Shopped in four weeks ending 7th June : 64588, D362, D6155, 44960, 65930, 61404. Scrapped in same period: 64581, 65217/57/304, 64822, 65928; 64499, 65237. Being scrapped: 57617/31, 68346, 90077/575. Awaiting scrapping or shopping-64599/600, 64795, 64950/86. 64946 was waiting at Kittybrewster. |
SLS/196307 |
18/01/1964 |
Bedford MPD (Shopped) |
Since the change over from steam to diesel in August, 1963, this depot has had no regular allocation but from 18th January the official allocation (previously O/L) is D4135/6 an D5379/80/1/2/3. |
SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 |
Inverurie Works (Shopped) |
Shopped: 44722, 61147, 64558/99, 65931, D3548, D6139/53. Scrapped: 60089/98, 60159/62, 60804/38, 64603, 64579, 90058. In shops: 45011, 44880, 45194, 65915, D5328. Being Cut Up: 61177. |
SLS/196403 |