Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 146 Today
» 963 Yesterday
» 146 Week
» 23284 Month
» 188184 Year
» 699286 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 471   11/1919
LNER (1924) 9471   08/1924
LNER (1946) 4597   10/1946
BR 64597   02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Reid
Class J37
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3711/1919
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L716
Works Number 22269
To Service During 11/1919
Withdrawal During 08/1966 off Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
Scrapping During 12/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 46 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
THJ Thornton Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/11/1952
62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 11/05/1957
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 06/07/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 13/07/1963
WDN   22/08/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1919 To Service To service as NBR Number 471
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22269
   
08/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9471    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4597    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64597    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
11/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
06/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
08/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 64597 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
12/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev