Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 159 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17962 Week
» 70978 Month
» 190505 Year
» 3217358 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
313 |
m/e |
11/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9313 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4595 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
64595 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
4w/e |
07/12/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/03/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/10/1962 |
Inverurie Works |
In shops: 45461, 64595, 65910; waiting: 80093. Awaiting scrapping: 44008, 47168, 47536, 57331/378/613, 65313, 69204. Scrapped five weeks ended 12/10; 57445/671, 64598/607, 64604/30, 64480/637/794. |
SLS/196211 |
09/11/1962 |
Inverurie Works (Ex Works) |
In shops : 42262/9, 61397, 65910, 80093, D260, D6142/4/7. Ex Works 45461, 64595. Scrapped in last 4 weeks-44008/253, 47168, 47536, 57331/613, 65313, 69204. Awaiting scrap: 44254, 57378, 64478, 90513. |
SLS/196212 |
18/02/1964 |
Thornton MPD |
64595 was on temporary stationary boiler and 65287 the usual stationary boiler. |
SLS/196403 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1919 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 313 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22272 |
|
|
09/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9313 |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4595 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64595 |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
03/03/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64595 from Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
07/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |
|
|