|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
18/08/1961 | Grangemouth MPD (65F) (Stored) | Stored on 18th August were-45177/8, 57265, 64593, 65306, whilst 55214 was stored some distance from the shed. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1919 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 479 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21957 |
||
04/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9479 | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4593 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64593 | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmont (POL) | ||
17/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) | ||
18/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kipps (65E) | ||
19/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) | ||
02/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmont (65K) | ||
29/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64593 from Polmont (65K) | ||
05/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |