Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 1021 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2324 Week
» 19640 Month
» 278499 Year
» 789601 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 477   01/1919
LNER (1924) 9477   06/1925
LNER (1946) 4591   10/1946
BR 64591   07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Reid
Class J37
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3701/1919
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L695
Works Number 21955
To Service During 01/1919
Withdrawal During 10/1964 off Thornton Junction (62A)
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 45 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PTH Perth (LNER) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64A St Margarets 4w/e 27/09/1958
62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 26/09/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64D Carstairs w/e 04/03/1950
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road w/e 25/03/1950
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 2w/e 26/09/1964
WDN   12/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1919 To Service To service as NBR Number 477
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21955
   
06/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9477    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4591    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth (LNER) (PTH)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64591    
17/08/1954 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
27/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
26/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 64591 from Thornton Junction (62A)    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev