|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. | SLS/195001 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1918 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 476 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21954 |
||
05/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9476 | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4590 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) | ||
24/12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64590 | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
14/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64590 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
06/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |