Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 1018 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2321 Week
» 19637 Month
» 278496 Year
» 789598 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 468   11/1918
LNER (1924) 9468   02/1925
LNER (1946) 4588   10/1946
BR 64588   03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Reid
Class J37
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3711/1918
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L695
Works Number 21952
To Service During 11/1918
Withdrawal During 06/1966 off Thornton Junction (62A)
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 47 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PTH Perth (LNER) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65F Grangemouth 4w/e 17/01/1959
65C Parkhead 4w/e 26/09/1959
64A St Margarets 4w/e 08/09/1962
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 19/01/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 17/01/1959
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 3w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 7w/e 29/12/1962
WDN   23/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1918 To Service To service as NBR Number 468
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21952
   
02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9468    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4588    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth (LNER) (PTH)    
03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64588    
17/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 64588 from Thornton Junction (62A)    
09/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev