Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 146 Today
» 963 Yesterday
» 146 Week
» 23284 Month
» 188184 Year
» 699286 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 465   11/1918
LNER (1924) 9465   09/1925
LNER (1946) 4585   09/1946
BR 64585   12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Reid
Class J37
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3711/1918
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L695
Works Number 21949
To Service During 11/1918
Withdrawal Wed 30/12/1964 off Dunfermline Upper (62C)
Scrapping During 03/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 46 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STG Stirling 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 06/07/1957
62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 16/01/1960
   Withdrawn 30/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 16/01/1960
WDN   02/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1918 To Service To service as NBR Number 465
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21949
   
09/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9465    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4585    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stirling (STG)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64585    
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
30/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 64585 from Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
03/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev