Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1344 Today
» 4706 Yesterday
» 22913 Week
» 13969 Month
» 360393 Year
» 3387246 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
461 |
m/e |
10/1918 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9461 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4581 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64581 |
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1918 |
EFD |
|
Eastfield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/12/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/06/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Scrapped) |
In Works: 42273, 45176, 61076, 61103, D8032. Shopped in four weeks ending 7th June : 64588, D362, D6155, 44960, 65930, 61404. Scrapped in same period: 64581, 65217/57/304, 64822, 65928; 64499, 65237. Being scrapped: 57617/31, 68346, 90077/575. Awaiting scrapping or shopping-64599/600, 64795, 64950/86. 64946 was waiting at Kittybrewster. |
SLS/196307 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1918 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 461 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21945 |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9461 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4581 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
09/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64581 |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64581 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|