Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1488 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19291 Week
» 72307 Month
» 191834 Year
» 3218687 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
460 |
m/e |
09/1918 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9460 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4580 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64580 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
4w/e |
11/07/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/10/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1918 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 460 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21944 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9460 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4580 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64580 |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
15/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64580 from Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |
|
|