|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/07/1961 | Aberdeen Ferryhill MPD (Ex-Works) | Ex-Works: 44281, 64576 an 65338. | SLS/196108 |
28/08/1961 | Inverurie Works (Scrap Yard-remains only) | Erecting Shop: D2412, D3550, D3934, D5329, D6149/56, 44281/3, 45136, 64548/59/61/86, 64612, 65931. Test Line: 44315, 64539. Works Sidings: D2417, D3547/53, D8028, 44183. Dead Line: 43902, 57572, 62682, 64636. Scrap Yard-intact: 40603, 55126, Scrap Yard-remains only: 40574/94, 40604/11/88, 43922, 55198, 56376, 57552/4, 57609, 62479, 64482, 64576. | SLS/196110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1918 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 456 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21940 |
||
11/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9456 | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4576 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) | ||
12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64576 | ||
19/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
19/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
04/04/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64576 from Dundee West (62B) | ||
09/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |