|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Further locos. ex Cowlairs Works that have been noted here during November were: Nos. 1728/45, 1764/6 (green, with 1766 snowplough fitted), 2406/31/64/75, 4574, 4605/39, 4817, 4932, 5924, 7465, 8096, 8471, 8957, 9144/62/73. | SLS/194801 |
31/12/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61061, 1724, 61909/94, 62411/17/29/55, 2462/69, 62472, 2480, 62485/98, 62675, 2691, 63019/63, 3172, 64527, 4568/74/77, 4922, 5908, 8453, 8952, 68958, 9133, 69150, 9193, 69221, 9518/64, 73777, 77016, 79306, 90313. | SLS/195002 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1918 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 454 Built at Cowlairs Works |
||
04/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9454 | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4574 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) | ||
01/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64574 | ||
27/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
27/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
17/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kipps (65E) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64574 from Kipps (65E) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Barnes and Bell: Coatbridge |