Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 146 Today
» 963 Yesterday
» 146 Week
» 23284 Month
» 188184 Year
» 699286 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 454   08/1918
LNER (1924) 9454   04/1924
LNER (1946) 4574   09/1946
BR 64574   01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Reid
Class J37
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3708/1918
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
To Service During 08/1918
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Kipps (65E)
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge)
Service Life 44 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DFU Dunfermline Upper 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64C Dalry Road 8w/e 27/10/1956
64A St Margarets 4w/e 27/09/1958
65E Kipps 4w/e 17/01/1959
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 08/09/1956
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 65E Kipps 4w/e 17/01/1959
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1918 To Service To service as NBR Number 454
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9454    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4574    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64574    
27/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
27/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
17/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kipps (65E)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64574 from Kipps (65E)    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Barnes and Bell: Coatbridge    

prev prev