Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 478 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19389 Week
» 84343 Month
» 287007 Year
» 3313860 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
314 |
m/e |
08/1918 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9314 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4572 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64572 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/09/1964 |
ALLOC |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
2w/e |
26/09/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/03/1962 |
Inverurie Works |
Awaiting shopping-44328, 64553, 64572 an 90455; shopped during last four weeks-44189, 64630, 65323/7; cut-up during last five weeks-55222/6/7/33, 56305, 57233/46/57, 57429, an 40619. Boilers and fireboxes in 'cemetery'-40574/94/603/18/9/50/63, 44319, 54491/3, 55198, 55207/8/15/6/22/6/7/30, 56305, 57257/349/429/552/4/85, 65246 an 68459. |
SLS/196204 |
18/04/1962 |
Inverurie Works (In shops) |
In shops-44322/28, 45009, 64572, 64606, 65905. Awaiting shops: 65479. Shopped in previous five weeks-64552/91, 64602/27, 65297. Cut up previous five weeks- 55165/229, 57559, 61996/8, 64542/53, 65296, 68338. Being cut up: 40645/7, 57411, 57557, 64628. Awaiting cut up: 57560, 64566, 64963. 64553 was involved in an accident which resulted in a large 'tear' along the frame and although there was a possibility of repair it was scrapped in the shops. The battery rail-car is back in shops after further trials. |
SLS/196205 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1918 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 314 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21938 |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9314 |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4572 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64572 |
|
|
14/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64572 from Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|