Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1613 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19416 Week
» 72432 Month
» 191959 Year
» 3218812 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
437 |
m/e |
06/1916 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9437 |
m/e |
06/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4565 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64555 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J37 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
To Service |
During 06/1916 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/10/1964 off Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
2w/e |
26/09/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/10/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/08/1947 |
Cowlairs Works |
On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. |
SLS/194710 |
30/10/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. |
SLS/194712 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1916 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 437 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
06/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9437 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4565 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64555 |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64555 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|