Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1857 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15263 Week
» 68279 Month
» 187806 Year
» 3214659 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
431 |
m/e |
11/1915 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9431 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4549 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64549 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J37 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
To Service |
During 11/1915 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 13/07/1964 off Thornton Junction (62A) |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/07/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
Cowlairs Works |
The following locos. have recently been fitted with new Cowlairs boilers: Nos. 4499 (1932 of 4/44), 4589 (1885 of 11/41), 4594 (1934 of 5/44), 4599 (1929 of 4/44), 4609 (1951 of 12/44), 5221 (1920 of 12/43), 6329 (1926 of 1/44). All the foregoing are fitted with Pop safety valves and L.N.E.R. type fire doors. No. 4549 (1953 of 4/45) is fitted with a L.N.E. firedoor, and No. 7479 (1990 01/11/46) with a N.B. type firedoor. Nos. 5221, 5329 and 7479 have only one steam pipe in the smokebox, instead of the usual two. No. 4477 has been fitted with a Mark II. graduated brake, whist Nos. 5247 and 5339 have the Mark III. pattern. No. 4795 was fitted with American type injectors in July, 1946. |
SLS/194702 |
31/07/1950 |
Cowlairs Works |
Engines due into Works, July 1950: 61754/71, 1931, 61983, 62208, 62424, 4549/61, 67605/67, 68324, 8450, 69187, 69219, 77230, 90262, 90498. |
SLS/195010 |
20/07/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Shopped) |
Shopped during six weeks ended 20th July: 42273, 45176, 61076/346/402, 64549, 65267/323/908/22/6, D5340, D6140/5/6. Scrapped in same period-57607, 64795/946/86, 65261, 67668, 68445/79. |
SLS/196309 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1915 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 431 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
09/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9431 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4549 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64549 |
|
|
13/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64549 from Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|