Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 1021 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2324 Week
» 19640 Month
» 278499 Year
» 789601 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 429   11/1915
LNER (1924) 9429   10/1925
LNER (1946) 4547   11/1946
BR 64547   08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Reid
Class J37
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3711/1915
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
To Service During 11/1915
Withdrawal During 12/1966 off Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
Scrapping During 04/1967 at J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Service Life 51 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64C Dalry Road 4w/e 19/05/1951
64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/11/1952
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 25/04/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 5w/e 11/04/1964
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1915 To Service To service as NBR Number 429
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9429    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4547    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64547    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
02/06/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. SLS 7/1962 Link
25/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 64547 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
04/1967 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev