Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 995 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 8002 Week
» 14136 Month
» 242020 Year
» 1463585 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 793 m/e 12/1900
LNER (1924) 9793 m/e 06/1925
LNER (1946) 5345 m/e 10/1946
BR 65345 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3612/1900
J3602/1923
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal Mon 05/06/1967 off Thornton Junction (62A)
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 66 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1900
THJ Thornton Junction 01/01/1948
64F Bathgate 5w/e 29/01/1966
62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 31/12/1966
   Withdrawn 05/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 5w/e 08/01/1966
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 31/12/1966
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 06/05/1967
WDN   05/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1923 Vacuum Ejector fitted
02/1923 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
02/1923 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
11/1942 Westinghouse Brake removed
11/1942 Steam Brake fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/10/1947 Eastfield MPD Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. SLS/194712
27/08/1949 Inverurie Works Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60888, 4500, 64502, 5345, 68710, ex L.M.S. 603, 17263, 17350/69. SLS/194910
01/05/1967 Last of Scottish steam The withdrawal list represents complete withdrawal of all steam locomotives allocated to the Scottish Region, with exception of two J36s, 65288 at Dunfermline and 65345 at Thornton. (65288 is rumoured for private preservation). Final steam allocation was withdrawn from following sheds on dates shown: Carstairs 2nd February, Ferryhill 18th March, St. Margaret's 22nd April, Beattock, Corkerhill, Dundee, Motherwell, Perth and Polmadie 1st May. SLS/196706

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 793
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
02/1923 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
02/1923 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
02/1923 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
06/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9793    
11/1942 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
11/1942 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5345    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65345    
29/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
05/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65345 from Thornton Junction (62A)    

prev prev