Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 872 Today
» 725 Yesterday
» 5825 Week
» 21804 Month
» 217258 Year
» 1101639 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 792 m/e 12/1900
LNER (1924) 9792 m/e 08/1925
LNER (1946) 5344 m/e 09/1946
BR 65344 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3612/1900
J3608/1918
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal Thu 25/10/1962 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 61 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BGT Bathgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64A St Margarets 4w/e 24/09/1960
   Withdrawn 25/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BGT Bathgate 19/01/1947
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 24/09/1960
WDN   25/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1918 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
08/1918 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
04/1948 Vacuum Ejector fitted
04/1948 Steam Brake fitted
04/1948 Westinghouse Brake removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as NBR Number 792
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
08/1918 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
08/1918 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
08/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9792    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5344    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT)    
04/1948 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
04/1948 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
04/1948 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65344    
24/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
25/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65344 from St Margarets (64A)    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle    

prev prev