Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 735 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5929 Week
» 12980 Month
» 235381 Year
» 1119762 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 791 m/e 12/1900
LNER (1924) 9791 m/e 08/1926
LNER (1946) 5343 m/e 12/1946
BR 65343 m/e 03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3612/1900
J3602/1920
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal Thu 18/02/1960 off Kipps (65E)
Scrapping During 04/1960 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 59 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BLA Blaydon 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65E Kipps 4w/e 19/05/1951
   Withdrawn 18/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BLA Blaydon w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 65E Kipps w/e 28/04/1951
ALLOC 65E Kipps 4w/e 19/05/1951
WDN   18/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1920 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
02/1920 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
04/1930 Westinghouse Brake removed
04/1930 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as NBR Number 791
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
02/1920 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
02/1920 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
08/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9791    
04/1930 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
04/1930 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5343    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kipps (65E)    
03/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 65343    
02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65343 from Kipps (65E)    
04/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev