Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 966 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7973 Week
» 14107 Month
» 241991 Year
» 1463556 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 788 m/e 07/1900
LNER (1924) 9788 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 5340 m/e 07/1946
BR 65340 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3607/1900
J3610/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 07/1900
Withdrawal Mon 21/01/1952 off Hawick (64G)
Scrapping During 02/1952 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 51 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1900
HAW Hawick 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 21/01/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   21/01/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
10/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
10/1944 Steam Brake fitted
10/1944 Westinghouse Brake removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/06/1949 Inverurie Works Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 61502, 4484, 5232/57, 65281, 5307, 65340. ex L.M.S. No. 4251. SLS/194907
30/06/1950 Inverurie Works Engines into shops: 5282, 5323, 61543, 61560, 62241, 62255, 64466, 64477, 64487, 65236, 65306, 65340, and (L.M.S) 14447, 17326, 44312, 57337. SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1900 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 788
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
10/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
10/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9788    
10/1944 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
10/1944 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5340    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hawick (HAW)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65340    
21/01/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 65340 from Hawick (64G)    

prev prev