Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 478 Today
» 996 Yesterday
» 478 Week
» 15189 Month
» 157143 Year
» 1041524 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 783 m/e 07/1900
LNER (1924) 9783 m/e 02/1925
LNER (1946) 5335 m/e 27/01/1946
BR 65335 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3607/1900
J3609/1922
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 07/1900
Withdrawal During 11/1963 off Grangemouth (65F)
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 63 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65D Dawsholm 4w/e 17/12/1960
65C Parkhead 4w/e 19/05/1962
65F Grangemouth 4w/e 08/09/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKD Parkhead w/e 02/04/1949
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 17/12/1960
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 09/06/1962
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 6w/e 18/08/1962
WDN   29/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1922 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
09/1922 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
04/1946 Steam Brake fitted
04/1946 Westinghouse Brake removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1900 To Service To service as NBR Number 783
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
09/1922 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
09/1922 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9783    
01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5335    
04/1946 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
04/1946 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65335    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65335 from Grangemouth (65F)    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick    

prev prev