Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 475 Today
» 996 Yesterday
» 475 Week
» 15186 Month
» 157140 Year
» 1041521 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 779 m/e 03/1900
LNER (1924) 9779 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 5331 m/e 10/02/1946
BR 65331 m/e 04/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3603/1900
J3611/1922
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 03/1900
Withdrawal During 08/1963 off Motherwell (66B)
Scrapping During 03/1964 at T W Ward (Inverkeithing)
Service Life 63 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BLA Blaydon 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64F Bathgate 4w/e 19/05/1951
64G Hawick 4w/e 17/05/1952
66B Motherwell 4w/e 16/02/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64F Bathgate w/e 28/04/1951
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 64G Hawick 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 4w/e 06/03/1963
WDN   07/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1922 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
11/1922 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
05/1954 Westinghouse Brake removed
05/1954 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1900 To Service To service as NBR Number 779
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
11/1922 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
11/1922 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9779    
02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5331    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
04/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 65331    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hawick (64G)    
05/1954 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
05/1954 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
16/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65331 from Motherwell (66B)    
03/1964 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Inverkeithing    

prev prev