Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 504 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 1369 Week
» 14402 Month
» 236803 Year
» 1121184 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 778 m/e 03/1900
LNER (1924) 9778 m/e 05/1926
LNER (1946) 5330 m/e 03/02/1946
BR 65330 m/e 08/1948

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Apple Green Black and White 10/1946
LNER Black Unlined 11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3603/1900
J3605/1923
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 03/1900
Withdrawal w/e Mon 18/06/1962 off Hawick (64G)
Scrapping During 06/1962 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 62 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64G Hawick 4w/e 22/10/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 22/10/1960
WDN   w/e 18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1923 Vacuum Ejector fitted
05/1923 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
05/1923 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
10/1946 Steam Brake fitted
10/1946 Westinghouse Brake removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1900 To Service To service as NBR Number 778
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
05/1923 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
05/1923 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
05/1923 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
05/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9778    
02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5330    
10/1946 Livery Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining    
10/1946 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
10/1946 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65330    
11/1951 Livery Change of livery to Wartime unlined black    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hawick (64G)    
06/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65330 from Hawick (64G)    

prev prev