Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 863 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7870 Week
» 14004 Month
» 241888 Year
» 1463453 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 777 m/e 03/1900
LNER (1924) 9777 m/e 01/1925
LNER (1946) 5329 on 14/03/1946
BR 65329 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3603/1900
J3602/1918
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 03/1900
Withdrawal Sat 28/12/1963 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 63 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1900
POL Polmont 01/01/1948
64A St Margarets 8w/e 09/09/1951
64F Bathgate 4w/e 03/08/1963
   Withdrawn 28/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64D Carstairs 30/04/1950
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 10/08/1963
WDN   28/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
02/1918 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
03/1946 Steam Brake fitted
03/1946 Westinghouse Brake removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 Cowlairs Works The following locos. have recently been fitted with new Cowlairs boilers: Nos. 4499 (1932 of 4/44), 4589 (1885 of 11/41), 4594 (1934 of 5/44), 4599 (1929 of 4/44), 4609 (1951 of 12/44), 5221 (1920 of 12/43), 6329 (1926 of 1/44). All the foregoing are fitted with Pop safety valves and L.N.E.R. type fire doors. No. 4549 (1953 of 4/45) is fitted with a L.N.E. firedoor, and No. 7479 (1990 01/11/46) with a N.B. type firedoor. Nos. 5221, 5329 and 7479 have only one steam pipe in the smokebox, instead of the usual two. No. 4477 has been fitted with a Mark II. graduated brake, whist Nos. 5247 and 5339 have the Mark III. pattern. No. 4795 was fitted with American type injectors in July, 1946. SLS/194702
31/12/1949 Inverurie Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61503, 62272/75, 64496, 4505, 64536, 65242, 5329, ex-L.M.S. 15224, 16278, 17347, 17460, 17611. SLS/195002
04/07/1961 Inverurie Works (Erecting Shops) Erecting Shops: D261, D2421, D3552, D6138/48, 43902, 44194, 44257, 64616/23, 65282, 65309/29. Waiting Works : 55185, 62479, 64494, 64612, 65261/81, 65900. Scrap Yard: 40574/94, 40688, 43868, 54475/83/8, 55198, 56240/6, 57232, 57324, 57552, 57609, 62474, 64471/82, 65276/95, 68459/71, 69136. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1900 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 777
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
02/1918 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
02/1918 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
01/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9777    
03/1946 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
03/1946 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
14/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5329    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65329    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
03/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
28/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65329 from Bathgate (64F)    

prev prev