Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 874 Today
» 725 Yesterday
» 5827 Week
» 21806 Month
» 217260 Year
» 1101641 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 777 m/e 03/1900
LNER (1924) 9777 m/e 01/1925
LNER (1946) 5329 m/e 14/03/1946
BR 65329 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3603/1900
J3602/1918
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 03/1900
Withdrawal Sat 28/12/1963 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 63 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
POL Polmont 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64A St Margarets 8w/e 09/09/1951
64F Bathgate 4w/e 03/08/1963
   Withdrawn 28/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64D Carstairs 30/04/1950
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 10/08/1963
WDN   28/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
02/1918 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
03/1946 Westinghouse Brake removed
03/1946 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1900 To Service To service as NBR Number 777
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
02/1918 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
02/1918 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
01/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9777    
03/1946 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
03/1946 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5329    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65329    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
03/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65329 from Bathgate (64F)    
07/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle    

prev prev