Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 474 Today
» 996 Yesterday
» 474 Week
» 15185 Month
» 157139 Year
» 1041520 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 775 m/e 01/1900
LNER (1924) 9775 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 5327 m/e 22/03/1946
BR 65327 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3601/1900
J3603/1922
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 01/1900
Withdrawal Sat 13/11/1965 off Thornton Junction (62A)
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 65 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BGT Bathgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64A St Margarets 5w/e 24/03/1951
62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 28/12/1963
62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 29/05/1965
   Withdrawn 13/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 3w/e 03/07/1965
WDN   13/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1922 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
03/1922 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
05/1943 Steam Brake fitted
05/1943 Westinghouse Brake removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1900 To Service To service as NBR Number 775
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
03/1922 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
03/1922 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9775    
05/1943 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
05/1943 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5327    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65327    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
29/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
13/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 65327 from Thornton Junction (62A)    
09/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev