Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1012 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 8019 Week
» 14153 Month
» 242037 Year
» 1463602 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 773 m/e 01/1900
LNER (1924) 9773 m/e 10/1924
LNER (1946) 5325 on 10/02/1946
BR 65325 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3601/1900
J3609/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 01/1900
Withdrawal Fri 29/11/1963 off Dawsholm (65D)
Scrapping During 03/1964 at T W Ward (Inverkeithing)
Service Life 63 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1900
KPS Kipps 01/01/1948
65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 19/01/1963
66B Motherwell 4w/e 16/02/1963
65D Dawsholm 4w/e 13/04/1963
   Withdrawn 29/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
HIRE B. & S.S., Gartsherrie   4w/e 24/12/1955
EXHIRE 65E Kipps 3w/e 17/03/1956
ALLOC 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 2w/e 12/01/1963
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 4w/e 06/03/1963
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 04/05/1963
WDN   29/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
09/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
05/1943 Westinghouse Brake removed
05/1943 Steam Brake fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/08/1947 Inverurie Works On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1900 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 773
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
09/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
09/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
10/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9773    
05/1943 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
05/1943 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5325    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65325    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)    
16/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
13/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
29/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65325 from Dawsholm (65D)    

prev prev