Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 503 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 503 Week
» 17303 Month
» 333534 Year
» 844636 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 771   01/1900
LNER (1924) 9771   12/1925
LNER (1946) 5323   03/03/1946
BR 65323   06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3601/1900
J3610/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 01/1900
Withdrawal During 12/1963 off Dunfermline Upper (62C)
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 63 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DFU Dunfermline Upper 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   28/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
10/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
12/1941 Steam Brake fitted
12/1941 Westinghouse Brake removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1900 To Service To service as NBR Number 771
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
10/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
10/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
12/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9771    
12/1941 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
12/1941 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5323    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65323    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65323 from Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick    

prev prev