Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 893 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7900 Week
» 14034 Month
» 241918 Year
» 1463483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 762 m/e 05/1899
LNER (1924) 9762 m/e 07/1926
LNER (1946) 5320 m/e 06/1946
BR 65320 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3605/1899
J3611/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 05/1899
Withdrawal w/e Mon 30/04/1962 off Parkhead (65C)
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 63 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1899
DFU Dunfermline Upper 01/01/1948
65C Parkhead 4w/e 07/05/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 30/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 07/05/1960
WDN   30/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
11/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
10/1946 Steam Brake fitted
10/1946 Westinghouse Brake removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/04/1952 Scottish Miscellany On 12th April the big-end of ex L.N.E. 2493 (Glen Gloy) became unstuck at Alloa and the Perth-Glasgow train had to go forward behind J37 65320. Traffic delays held train back until it reached L.N.E. main line at Castlecary but there-after running was steady, with crew nursing the Alloa pilot all the way.
A goodly number of ex L.M. class 5 engines are to be found working in the Fife area. Ex L.M. 4-6-0 45584 was noted working through Dunfermline. Ex C.R. 4-4-0 54499 is to be found regularly on 11.12 Stirling-Callarider turn. 54447 is still fitted with unlined, uncrested tender.
The last B1 ex N.B.L. came out on 24th April. No. 61399 completes the order. The K1 class appear to be used solely on goods work on West Highland turns. On 4th May the Queen St.-Hamilton-Helensburgh-Milngavie Sunday trains re-commence with more local stations being opened. One of the 'Clan' class 4-6-2 engines appears frequently in St. Enoch Station on 12.20 ex Stranraer, returning there on 17.10 (17.15 SO) ex St. Enoch.
SLS/195207

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1899 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 762
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
11/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
11/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
07/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9762    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5320    
10/1946 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
10/1946 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65320    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
30/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65320 from Parkhead (65C)    

prev prev