Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 503 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 503 Week
» 17303 Month
» 333534 Year
» 844636 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 761   05/1899
LNER (1924) 9761   05/1925
LNER (1946) 5319   07/1946
BR 65319   10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3605/1899
J3605/1919
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 05/1899
Withdrawal During 09/1966 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 12/1966 at Campbells (Airdrie)
Service Life 67 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64F Bathgate 5w/e 29/01/1966
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1966
64A St Margarets 5w/e 24/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 5w/e 08/01/1966
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 5w/e 10/09/1966
WDN   26/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1919 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
05/1919 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
06/1935 Vacuum Ejector fitted
11/1942 Westinghouse Brake removed
11/1942 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1899 To Service To service as NBR Number 761
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
05/1919 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
05/1919 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9761    
06/1935 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
11/1942 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
11/1942 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5319    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65319    
02/06/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. SLS 7/1962 Link
29/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 65319 from St Margarets (64A)    
24/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
12/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev