Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 870 Today
» 725 Yesterday
» 5823 Week
» 21802 Month
» 217256 Year
» 1101637 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 758 m/e 04/1899
LNER (1924) 9758 m/e 11/1924
LNER (1946) 5316 m/e 09/1946
BR 65316 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3604/1899
J3605/1919
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 04/1899
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 63 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64G Hawick 4w/e 21/04/1951
64E Polmont 4w/e 02/08/1958
64G Hawick 4w/e 23/09/1961
64F Bathgate 4w/e 16/06/1962
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64G Hawick w/e 07/04/1951
ALLOC 64E Polmont 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 64G Hawick 2w/e 09/09/1961
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 09/06/1962
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1919 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
05/1919 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
01/1943 Westinghouse Brake removed
01/1943 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1899 To Service To service as NBR Number 758
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
05/1919 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
05/1919 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
11/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9758    
01/1943 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
01/1943 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5316    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65316    
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hawick (64G)    
02/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Polmont (64E)    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hawick (64G)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65316 from Bathgate (64F)    
09/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev