Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3001 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16407 Week
» 69423 Month
» 188950 Year
» 3215803 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
758 |
m/e |
04/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9758 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5316 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65316 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 04/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 off Bathgate (64F) |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64G |
Hawick |
w/e |
07/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
64E |
Polmont |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
ALLOC |
64G |
Hawick |
2w/e |
09/09/1961 |
ALLOC |
64F |
Bathgate |
4w/e |
09/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1919 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
05/1919 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
01/1943 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
01/1943 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/07/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 62059, 2248, 64490/91, 5245/85/87, 65290, 5310, 65316, ex L.M.S. Nos. 645, 17267, 17302, 17654. |
SLS/194908 |
11/09/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Being cup up) |
In Shops: 44724, 45066, 80126; awaiting shops-42737, 45475. Shopped during period 5/8-6/9: 42129, 65234, 65908/22, D6140/3/4. Scrapped during same period: 57565, 61260, 65210/41/60, 67606/15/49/74. Being cup up: 60851, 65316. Awaiting cut up: 60959, 64568, 90536/42. |
SLS/196310 |
10/10/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Scrapped) |
42737, 42909, 45475, 65918. In Scrap Yard: 60819/27, 64627, 65253/341. Shopped four weeks ended 4/10-44724, 45066, 80126, D6148/50, D8031; Scrapped same period-45049, 60851/959, 64568, 65316, 90193, 90536/42. |
SLS/196311 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 758 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1919 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1919 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9758 |
|
|
01/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5316 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65316 |
|
|
07/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hawick (64G) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hawick (64G) |
|
|
02/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmont (64E) |
|
|
23/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hawick (64G) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65316 from Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|