Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 504 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 1369 Week
» 14402 Month
» 236803 Year
» 1121184 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 757 m/e 04/1899
LNER (1924) 9757 m/e 05/1926
LNER (1946) 5315 m/e 11/1946
BR 65315 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3604/1899
J3603/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 04/1899
Withdrawal w/e Mon 30/04/1962 off Eastfield (65A)
Scrapping During 04/1963 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 63 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn w/e 30/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BGT Bathgate 24/08/1947
ALLOC EFD Eastfield w/e 20/12/1947
WDN   30/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
03/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
05/1926 Vacuum Ejector fitted
12/1945 Westinghouse Brake removed
12/1945 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1899 To Service To service as NBR Number 757
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
03/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
03/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
05/1926 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
05/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9757    
12/1945 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
12/1945 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5315    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65315    
30/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65315 from Eastfield (65A)    
04/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick    

prev prev