Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2022 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19825 Week
» 72841 Month
» 192368 Year
» 3219221 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
755 |
m/e |
03/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9755 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5313 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65313 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 03/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 30/07/1962 off Fort William (63B) |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
POL |
Polmont |
w/e |
01/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
FTW |
|
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/07/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1921 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
12/1921 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1945 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
03/1945 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/06/1961 |
Fort William MPD |
On 16th June, 44255 (the 'snow-plough' engine) was noted ex store and acting as station pilot. 65300/13 are still in use. |
SLS/196108 |
15/10/1962 |
Inverurie Works |
In shops: 45461, 64595, 65910; waiting: 80093. Awaiting scrapping: 44008, 47168, 47536, 57331/378/613, 65313, 69204. Scrapped five weeks ended 12/10; 57445/671, 64598/607, 64604/30, 64480/637/794. |
SLS/196211 |
09/11/1962 |
Inverurie Works |
In shops : 42262/9, 61397, 65910, 80093, D260, D6142/4/7. Ex Works 45461, 64595. Scrapped in last 4 weeks-44008/253, 47168, 47536, 57331/613, 65313, 69204. Awaiting scrap: 44254, 57378, 64478, 90513. |
SLS/196212 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 755 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9755 |
|
|
1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5313 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL) |
|
|
10/01/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65313 |
|
|
11/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
11/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fort William (63B) |
|
|
30/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65313 from Fort William (63B) |
|
|
10/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|