Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 576 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 3971 Week
» 19950 Month
» 215404 Year
» 1099785 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 755 m/e 03/1899
LNER (1924) 9755 m/e 12/1924
LNER (1946) 5313 m/e 07/1946
BR 65313 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3603/1899
J3612/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 03/1899
Withdrawal w/e Mon 30/07/1962 off Fort William (63B)
Scrapping During 10/1962 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 63 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
POL Polmont 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65A Eastfield 4w/e 11/03/1961
63B Fort William 4w/e 11/03/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 30/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC POL Polmont w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC FTW   w/e 10/01/1948
WDN   w/e 30/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
12/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted
1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted
03/1945 Westinghouse Brake removed
03/1945 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1899 To Service To service as NBR Number 755
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
12/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
12/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9755    
1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/1945 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
03/1945 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5313    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65313    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Fort William (63B)    
30/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65313 from Fort William (63B)    
10/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev